Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
30.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
10.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
27.05.2005 | Change - applicant | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
18.06.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
18.06.2004 | Change - English title | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
18.06.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
04.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
04.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
27.02.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.12.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
22.08.2003 | First examination report | |
19.08.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.05.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
16.05.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
24.04.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.04.2003 | Change - extension states | |
23.04.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.04.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication |