Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6739645 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2004 | B2 | US2003197397 | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0211208 | 07.10.2002 | DE10149456 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1322488 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2004 | B1 | EP1322488 | 02.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0211208 | 07.10.2002 | DE10149456 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50200744D1 | 09.09.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0211208 | 07.10.2002 | DE10149456 | 08.10.2001 | DE50200744 | 07.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03031213 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10149456 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10149456 | 30.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10149456 | 08.10.2001 |