EP1438877 - PWM CONTROL OF LED BASED ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHU, Subramanian Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SCHUURMANS, Frank, J., P. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02800685.6 | 30.09.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002IB04027 | Priority number, date | US20010972111 | 05.10.2001 Original published format: US 972111 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032689 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438877 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438877 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H05B45/22 (EP,US);
H05B45/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PWM-STEUERUNG VON ARRAYS AUF LED-BASIS | [2004/30] | English: | PWM CONTROL OF LED BASED ARRAYS | [2004/30] | French: | COMMANDE PWM D'ENSEMBLES A LED | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 02.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | CY | 10.05.2006 | CZ | 10.05.2006 | EE | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | IT | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | SK | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | BG | 10.08.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | LU | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | IE | 02.10.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
LU | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2714564 (ETAT FRANCAIS LABO CL PONTS CH [FR]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 8 - page 7, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]US5783909 (HOCHSTEIN PETER A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 22 * * column A; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US6127783 (PASHLEY MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 18; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO0158218 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1* page 1, line 27 - page 1, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10013208 (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH DORN [AT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,2 * |