EP1448554 - PROPYLCARBAMATE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF SERINE AND CYSTEINE PROTEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEATON, David Norman, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
CATALANO, John George, GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, P.O. Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Cooke, Tracey (GB) GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road GB-Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02800886.0 | 02.10.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US31480 | Priority number, date | US20010327938P | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 327938 P | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031437 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448554 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/14, C07D417/12, C07D401/14, A61K31/535, A61K31/44, A61P19/10 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 29.03.2004 | LV | 29.03.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 29.03.2004 | SI | 29.03.2004 | Title | German: | PROPYLCARBAMATDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON SERIN- UND CYSTEINPROTEASEN | [2004/35] | English: | PROPYLCARBAMATE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF SERINE AND CYSTEINE PROTEASES | [2004/35] | French: | DERIVES PROPYLCARBAMATE UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DES SERINE PROTEASES ET DES CYSTEINE PROTEASES | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4552866 (DELANEY NORMA G [US], et al) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [A]US5047400 (VINCENT MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9816505 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X] - GROARKE M ET AL, "Synthesis of ketomethylene amino pseudopeptide analogues via reductive amination of glyoxals derived from alpha-amino acids", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (200001), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 153 - 155, XP004188805 [X] 1-19 * Table 1, second compound to the right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00637-X |