Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1435169
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
30.05.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
27.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.05.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2007 |
Change - name/address |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
02.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
27.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - name/address |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
10.08.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
31.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
21.05.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
23.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
18.03.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|