Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7447217 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2008 | B2 | US2004246968 | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0211018 | 01.10.2002 | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1435169 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2008 | B1 | EP1435169 | 07.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02801304 | 01.10.2002 | EP0211018 | 01.10.2002 | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50212452D1 | 14.08.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0211018 | 01.10.2002 | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03034703 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1303118 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100574349C | 23.12.2009 | C | CN1568612 | 19.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2309235T | 16.12.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP01124526 | 12.10.2001 |