EP1438133 - PHOSPHINITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTSCH, Michael Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 38 67433 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Robert U 4, 18 68161 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
KUNSMANN-KEITEL, Dagmar, Pascale Neuhofener Str. 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 04 /
HADERLEIN, Gerd Hochgewanne 93a 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 05 /
JUNGKAMP, Tim Magnolialaan 19 2950 Kapellen / DE | 06 /
ALTMAYER, Marco Heddesheimer Str. 42 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | 07 /
SIEGEL, Wolfgang Goethestrasse 34b 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 08 /
MOLNAR, Ferenc Keplerstrasse 5 67346 Speyer / DE | [2004/36] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
BARTSCH, Michael Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 38 67433 Neustadt / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMANN, Robert U 4, 18 68161 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
KUNSMANN-KEITEL, Dagmar, Pascale Neuhofener Str. 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
04 /
HADERLEIN, Gerd Saalbaustr. 27 64283 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
JUNGKAMP, Tim Magnolialaan 19 2950 Kapellen / DE | |||
06 /
ALTMAYER, Marco Heddesheimer Str. 42 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | |||
07 /
SIEGEL, Wolfgang Goethestrasse 34b 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
08 /
MOLNAR, Ferenc Keplerstrasse 5 67346 Speyer / DE | |||
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
BARTSCH, Michael Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 38 67433 Neustadt / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMANN, Robert U 4, 18 68161 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
KUNSMANN-KEITEL, Dagmar, Pascale Neuhofener Str. 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
04 /
HADERLEIN, Gerd Saalbaustr. 27 64283 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
JUNGKAMP, Tim Kirchstr. 20 69221 Dossenheim / DE | |||
06 /
ALTMAYER, Marco Schulstrasse 1 68199 Mannheim / DE | |||
07 /
SIEGEL, Wolfgang Goethestrasse 34b 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | |||
08 /
MOLNAR, Ferenc Keplerstrasse 5 67346 Speyer / DE | Application number, filing date | 02801309.2 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002EP11108 | Priority number, date | DE2001150286 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150286 | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033142 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438133 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/18, C07C253/10, C07F9/50 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C07F9/46 (EP,US);
C07F9/50 (KR);
B01J31/1875 (EP,US);
C07C253/10 (EP,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,US);
B01J2231/323 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C253/10, C07C255/04 (EP,US);
C07C253/10, C07C255/07 (US,EP);
C07C253/30, C07C255/04 (US,EP);
C07C253/30, C07C255/07 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOSPHINITE | [2004/30] | English: | PHOSPHINITES | [2004/30] | French: | PHOSPHINITES | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0240491 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US]) [PX] 1-7 * Liganden/Ligands L20 & L119;; claims 14,18,37 *; | [X]WO9819985 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 20, line 28 *; | [A]WO9629303 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5510470 (CASALNUOVO ALBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PX] - ZHOU Y-G ET AL, "Highly effective chiral ortho-substituted BINAPO ligands (o-BINAPO): applications in Ru-catalysed asymmetric hydrogenations of beta-aryl-substituted beta-(acylamino)acrylates and beta-keto esters", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020308), vol. 124, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4952 - 4953, XP001106877 [PX] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja020121u | [A] - LESUEUR W ET AL, "A bidentate bisphosphine functioning in intramolecular aliphatic metalation and as an NMR spectroscopic probe for the metal coordination environment", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19970716), vol. 36, no. 15, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 3354 - 3362, XP002224116 [A] 1-14 * page 3362, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic9700819 |