11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
16.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
07.08.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
29.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.07.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
31.03.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
13.02.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
16.01.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
10.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.10.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.02.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.01.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
21.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
15.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
02.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
23.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|