EP1441031 - ENZYME GENE PARTICIPATING IN THE SYNTHESIS OF POLYESTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOMIZO, Satoru Sanseiso, 31-17, Shioyacho 6-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0872 / JP | 02 /
FUKUCHI, Takeshi 304, Sezon-asagiri, 123, Asagiricho 3-chome Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673-0866 / JP | 03 /
OSAKADA, Fumio 17-7, Daianjihigashimachi Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0063 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Keiji 11-33, Omoricho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8023 / JP | 05 /
TAKAGI, Masamichi 31-10, Sakaecho 1-chome Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-0051 / JP | 06 /
OHTA, Akinori 57-2, Puraza Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-0063 / JP | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02801508.9 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002JP10461 | Priority number, date | JP20010312178 | 10.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001312178 | [2004/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033707 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441031 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N15/81, C12N1/19, C12P7/62 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/40 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12P7/625 (EP,US);
C07K2319/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENZYMGEN, DAS AN DER SYNTHESE VON POLYESTER BETEILIGT IST, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTER UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES GENS | [2004/31] | English: | ENZYME GENE PARTICIPATING IN THE SYNTHESIS OF POLYESTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYESTER USING THE SAME | [2004/31] | French: | GENE D'ENZYME PARTICIPANT A LA SYNTHESE DE POLYESTER ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYESTER A L'AIDE DUDIT GENE | [2004/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2004 | Translation filed | 16.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO0188144 [ ] (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al); | [PY] - EMBL, (20020910), Database accession no. BD103442, URL: EBI, XP002377462 [PY] 1-23 * column A * | [PY] - EMBL, (20020910), Database accession no. BD103443, URL: EBI, XP002377463 [PY] 1-23 * column A * | [Y] - EMBL, (19970821), Database accession no. D88825, URL: EBI, XP002377464 [Y] 1-23 * column A * | [Y] - FUKUI T ET AL, "CO-EXPRESSION OF POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE SYNTHASE AND (R)-ENOYL-COA HYDRATASE GENES OF AEROMONAS CAVIAE ESTABLISHES COPOLYESTER BIOSYNTHESIS PATHWAY IN ESCHERICHIA COLI", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1999), vol. 170, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 69 - 75, XP002945005 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1097(98)00526-6 | [Y] - SUBRAMANI SURESH, "Protein import into peroxisomes and biogenesis of the organelle", ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL BIOLOGY ANNUAL REVIEWS INC. {A}, P.O. BOX 10139, 4139 EL CAMINO WAY, PALO ALTO, CALIFORNIA 94306, USA SERIES : ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL BIOLOGY (ISSN 0743-4634), (1993), ISSN 0-8243-3109-5, pages 445 - 478, XP009065380 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.cb.09.110193.002305 | [Y] - ALLENBACH LAURE ET AL, "Analysis of the alternative pathways for the beta-oxidation of unsaturated fatty acids using transgenic plants synthesizing polyhydroxyalkanoates in peroxisomes", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (200011), vol. 124, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1159 - 1168, XP002377458 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.124.3.1159 | [A] - MIURA Y ET AL, "Production of the carotenoids lycopene, beta-carotene and astaxanthin in the food yeast Candida utilis", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (199804), vol. 64, no. 4, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1226 - 1229, XP002977111 | [ ] - FUKUI ET AL, "Cloning and analysis of the poly(3- hydroxybutyrate co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) biosynthesis genes of Aeromonas caviae", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199708), vol. 179, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4821 - 4830, XP002113257 | International search | [Y]EP0824148 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]); | [XP]JP2002262886 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [Y] - MITTENDORF V. ET AL., "Synthesis of medium-chain-length polyhydroxyalkanoates in arbidopsis thaliana using untermediates of peroxisomal fatty acid beta-oxidation", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 23, pages 13397 - 13402, XP002143031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.23.13397 | [Y] - FUKUI T. ET AL., "Cloning and analysis of the poly(3-hydroxybutyrate-co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) biosynthesis genes of aeromonas caviae", J. BACTERIOL., (1997), vol. 179, no. 15, pages 4821 - 4830, XP002113257 | [Y] - KEIJI KONDO, "Kobo candida utilis no ishu idenshi hatsugenkei", KAGAKU TO SEIBUTSU, (2000), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 614 - 620, XP002963732 | [XP] - POIRIER Y. ET AL., "Synthesis of polyhydroxyalkanoate in the peroxisome of saccharomyces cerevisiae by using intermediates of fatty acid beta-oxidation", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (200111), vol. 67, no. 11, pages 5254 - 5260, XP002963733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.11.5254-5260.2001 | [A] - LEAF T.A. ET AL., "Saccharomyces cerevisiae expressing bacterial polyhydroxybutyrate synthase produces poly-3-hydroxybutyrate", MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 142, no. 5, pages 1169 - 1180, XP000925314 | [A] - REN Q. ET AL., "FabG, an NADPH-dependent 3-ketoacyl reductase of pseudomonas aeruginosa, provides precursors for medium-chain-length poly-3-hydroxyalkanoate biosynthesis in escherichia coli", J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, no. 10, pages 2978 - 2981, XP002963734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.10.2978-2981.2000 | [A] - HETTEMA E.H. ET AL., "Import of proteins into peroxisomes", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1999), vol. 1451, no. 1, pages 17 - 34, XP004278021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4889(99)00087-7 |