EP1435263 - PHOTOCATALYTIC MATERIAL SELECTIVELY INACTIVATING BIOLOGICALLY HARMFUL SUBSTANCE AND UTILIZATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 1-36, Noritake-Shinmachi 3-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-8501 / JP | For all designated states Yamaguchi, Koushi 14-16, Honcho 1-chome Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 1-36, Noritake-Shinmachi 3-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Yamaguchi, Koushi 14-16, Honcho 1-chome Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Koushi 1-14-16, Honmachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-0004 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Yoichi, c/o NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 3-1-36, Noritakeshinmachi, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | 03 /
KUROBE, Hisanori, c/o NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 3-1-36, Noritakeshinmachi, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Shinji, c/o NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 3-1-36, Noritakeshinmachi, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Hirokazu, c/o NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 3-1-36, Noritakeshinmachi, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | 06 /
IWATA, Misao, c/o NORITAKE CO., LIMITED 3-1-36, Noritakeshinmachi, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-8501 / JP | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02801509.7 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002JP10462 | Priority number, date | JP20010313174 | 10.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001313174 | JP20010321168 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001321168 | JP20010321169 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001321169 | JP20010321170 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001321170 | [2004/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033143 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435263 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/02 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
A61M1/3681 (EP,US);
B01J37/02 (KR);
A61L2/0011 (EP,US);
A61L2/0082 (EP,US);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61M1/3683 (EP,US);
B01J31/0254 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOKATALYTISCHES MATERIAL, DAS SELEKTIV EINE BIOLOGISCH SCHÄDLICHE SUBSTANZ DESAKTIVIERT, UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2004/28] | English: | PHOTOCATALYTIC MATERIAL SELECTIVELY INACTIVATING BIOLOGICALLY HARMFUL SUBSTANCE AND UTILIZATION THEREOF | [2004/28] | French: | MATIERE PHOTOCATALYTIQUE INACTIVANT DE MANIERE SELECTIVE UNE SUBSTANCE BIOLOGIQUEMENT NOCIVE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2004 | Translation filed | 19.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 08.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05240825 (KANAGAWA PREFECTURE); | [A]JP2001062253 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001239257 (ORGANO KK) |