EP1436829 - SUBSTRATE SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, John, M. 2811 Colony View Place Hayward, CA 94541 / US | 02 /
HOSOKAWA, Akihiro 10264 Danube Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02801637.6 | 24.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US30268 | Priority number, date | US20010982406 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: US 982406 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03034473 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1436829 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H01L21/6875 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
H01L21/67309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Title | German: | SUBSTRATHALTERUNG | [2004/29] | English: | SUBSTRATE SUPPORT | [2004/29] | French: | SUPPORT DE SUBSTRAT | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH02121347 ; | [XAY]JPH09293684 ; | [XAY]US6222337 (KROEKER TONY [US], et al) [X] 8,20,21 * column 8, lines 13-21 * [A] 1,23,40,44 [Y] 2,3,33,34; | [XA]JP2000353737 ; | [XA]JP2000183146 ; | [XA]JPS62193139 ; | [XA]JPH0424943 ; | [YA]US6082950 (ALTWOOD ALLEN [US], et al) [Y] 44-46 * abstract * [A] 1,8,23,40 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900727), vol. 014, no. 348, Database accession no. (E - 0957), & JP02121347 A 19900509 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1,4,6-9,15,17-19,22,23,29,31,38 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,10,11,13,24-27,33-35,39,40,42-46 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09293684 A 19971111 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 8 * abstract * [A] 1,23,44 [Y] 5,10,11,13,24-27,35,39,40,42,43 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000353737 A 20001219 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,5,8-10,12,13,15,16,23,24,26,27,29,30 * abstract * [A] 40,44 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000183146 A 20000630 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [X] 8,17,18 * abstract * [A] 1,23,40,44 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880204), vol. 012, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 580), & JP62193139 A 19870825 (CANON INC) [X] 8,17,18 * abstract * [A] 1,23,40,44 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920507), vol. 016, no. 188, Database accession no. (E - 1198), & JP04024943 A 19920128 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 8,18 * abstract * [A] 1,23,40,44 |