EP1436298 - HIMBACINE ANALOGUES AS THROMBIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033-0530 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHACKALAMANNIL, Samuel 17 Windy Heights Road Califon, New Jersey 07830 / US | 02 /
CHELLIAH, Mariappan, V. 42K Reading Road Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 03 /
CLASBY, Martin, C. 79 Elsie Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 04 /
XIA, Yan 137 Christie Street Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Jaap, David Robert, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Jaap, David Robert, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/29] | Wiedemann, Peter Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02801732.5 | 16.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US32936 | Priority number, date | US20010330359P | 18.10.2001 Original published format: US 330359 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033501 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436298 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436298 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, A61K31/445, A61K31/34, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A61P9/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | 06.04.2004 | LT | 06.04.2004 | LV | 06.04.2004 | MK | 06.04.2004 | RO | 06.04.2004 | SI | 06.04.2004 | Title | German: | HIMBACINANALOGA ALS THROMBINREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN | [2004/29] | English: | HIMBACINE ANALOGUES AS THROMBIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2004/29] | French: | ANALOGUES D'HIMBACINE EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS DE LA THROMBINE | [2011/15] |
Former [2004/29] | ANALOGUES D'HIMBACINE TELS QUE DES ANTAGONISTES RECEPTEURS DE LATHROMBINE | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2011 | BE | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | IT | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 16.10.2011 | LU | 16.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | ES | 01.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
LU | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
LU | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 16.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 21.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5716952 (WOLDEMUSSIE ELIZABETH [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 20; claim 3 *; | [Y]EP1138679 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1- *; | [Y] - M. J. MALASKA ET AL., "Chemical modification of ring C of himbacine: discovery of a pharmacophoric element for M2-selectivity", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1995), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 61 - 66, XP002222738 [Y] 1-7 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(94)00459-S | [Y] - M. TAKADOI ET AL., "A novel total synthesis of (+)-himbacine, a potent antagonist of the muscarinic receptor of M2 subtype", TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1999), vol. 40, no. 17, pages 3399 - 3402, XP004162293 [Y] 1-7 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(99)00473-6 | [Y] - D. DOLLER ET AL., "Design, synthesis, and structure-activity relationship studies of himbacine derived muscarinic receptor antagonists", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 901 - 906, XP004160496 [Y] 1-7 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00101-8 |