EP1437948 - CIGARETTE HAVING AN INCREASED TENDENCY TO SELF-EXTINGUISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states delfortgroup AG Fabrikstrasse 20 4050 Traun / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states delfort group AG Fabrikstrasse 20 4050 Traun / AT | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Tann-Papier Gesellschaft m.b.H. Fabriksstrasse 20 A-4050 Traun / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIBL, Markus Freiung 11/6 A-4600 Wels / AT | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Torggler, Paul N., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 02801805.9 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002AT00126 | Priority number, date | AT20010000818U | 22.10.2001 Original published format: AT 81801 U | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03034845 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437948 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
A24D1/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIGARETTE MIT ERHÖHTER SELBSTVERLÖSCHUNGSTENDENZ | [2004/30] | English: | CIGARETTE HAVING AN INCREASED TENDENCY TO SELF-EXTINGUISH | [2004/30] | French: | CIGARETTE AYANT UNE MEILLEURE APTITUDE A L'AUTO-EXTINCTION | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0864259 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [XD] 1,2,4 * abstract * * claims 1,9,12 *; | [X]US4889145 (ADAMS BRIAN [IE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 12 - line 22 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 2 *; | [A]EP0870437 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2666437 (ALPHONSE LATTOF) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0981971 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0486213 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]); | [A]US4480650 (WEINERT FRIEDRICH [US]); | [A]EP0671505 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]EP0262550 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) |