Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7345088 | ![]() | 18.03.2008 | B2 | US2005014726 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | US49304204 | 23.08.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040066103 | ![]() | 23.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005506371 | ![]() | 03.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002363089B | ![]() | 16.02.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1443942 | ![]() | 02.01.2008 | B1 | EP1443942 | 11.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0213410 | 03.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2461085 | 01.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60224429T | 18.12.2008 | T2 | DE60224429D1 | 14.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1443942T | 19.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1080733 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0402061 | 29.05.2007 | A3 | HUP0402061 | 28.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL161090 | 15.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04003671 | 20.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20042056L | 18.05.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ532282 | 24.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL367707 | 07.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1443942T | 31.08.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02801899 | 18.10.2002 | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | EP0211696 | 18.10.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03035081 | ![]() | 01.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE382347T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100372539C | 05.03.2008 | C | CN1703226 | 30.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5570672 | 31.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP045054 | 28.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2301710T | 01.07.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1443942E | 07.04.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2317819 | 27.02.2008 | C2 | RU2004115337 | 20.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200402089 | 22.06.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | US34592101 | 19.10.2001 |