EP1444873 - MAMMOGRAPHY SYSTEM AND METHOD EMPLOYING OFFSET COMPRESSION PADDLES, AUTOMATIC COLLIMATION, AND RETRACTABLE ANTI-SCATTER GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLOGIC, INC. 35 Crosby Drive Bedford Massachusetts 01730-1401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states HOLOGIC, INC. 35 Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730-1401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFREITAS, Kenneth, F. 52 Lake Port Drive Patterson, NY 12563 / US | 02 /
PELLEGRINO, Anthony 23 Sunswept Drive New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US | 03 /
FARBIZIO, Thomas, A. 122-A Maple Avenue, 98 Patterson, NY 12563 / US | 04 /
JANER, Roman 20 Old Mill Road Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02802148.3 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002US33058 | Priority number, date | US20010350213P | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 350213 P | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03037046 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1444873 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/34, H05G1/64, G03B42/02, A61B6/04 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B6/04 (US);
A61B6/0414 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/4233 (EP,US);
A61B6/488 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAMMOGRAPHIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT VERSETZTEN KOMPRESSIONSSCHAUFELN, AUTOMATISCHER KOLLIMATION UND ZURÜCKZIEHBAREM ANTISTREUGITTER | [2004/33] | English: | MAMMOGRAPHY SYSTEM AND METHOD EMPLOYING OFFSET COMPRESSION PADDLES, AUTOMATIC COLLIMATION, AND RETRACTABLE ANTI-SCATTER GRID | [2004/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MAMMOGRAPHIE UTILISANT DES PALPATEURS DE COMPRESSION EXCENTRES, LA COLLIMATION AUTOMATIQUE ET UNE GRILLE ANTI-DIFFUSION RETRACTABLE | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 06.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4989227 (TIRELLI MARCO [FR], et al); | [Y]USRE33634E ; | [YP]US6327336 (GINGOLD ERIC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3502878 | US3863073 | US3971950 | US4559641 | US4989227 | US5199056 | US5627869 | US6149301 |