EP1434596 - ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES BY AGONIST 4-1BB-ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/28] | ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES BY 4-1BB-BINDING AGENTS | ||
[2008/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lieping 2821 Char Lane, N.E. Rochester, MN 55906 / US | 02 /
STROME, Scott, E. 428 Eagle Lane SW Rochester, MN 55902 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Dr. Gassner & Partner Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02802551.8 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US32364 | Priority number, date | US20010328004P | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 328004 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049755 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434596 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434596 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/17, A61K39/395 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/464499 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5152 (US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/585 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K39/00 (US);
C12N2710/20034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AGONISTISCHEN 4-1BB ANTIKÖRPERN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER IMMUNANTWORT | [2008/52] | English: | ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES BY AGONIST 4-1BB-ANTIBODIES | [2008/52] | French: | AMELIORATION DES REPONSES IMMUNITAIRES PAR DES ANTICORPS AGONISTES LIANT 4-1BB | [2008/52] |
Former [2004/28] | VERWENDUNG VON 4-1BB BINDENDEN AGENZIEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER IMMUNANTWORT | ||
Former [2004/28] | ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES BY 4-1BB-BINDING AGENTS | ||
Former [2004/28] | AMELIORATION DES REPONSES IMMUNITAIRES PAR DES AGENTS LIANT 4-1BB | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2008 | 27.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | IE | 09.10.2009 | LU | 09.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
TR | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 09.10.2009 | ||
LU | 09.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 09.10.2009 | ||
LU | 09.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 09.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9936093 (ADVANCED RES & TECH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-52 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0029582 (PACIFIC NORTHWEST RESEARCH INS [US], et al) [X] 1-52 * examples 1-5; pages 45-46 *; | [X]WO0041508 (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1-52 * pages 30, lins 26-30; page 33, lines 17-22; example *; | [E]WO03006632 (CANVAC [CA], et al) [E] 1-52* the whole document *; | [X] - MELERO I ET AL, "AMPLIFICATION OF TUMOR IMMUNITY BY GENE TRANSFER OF THE CO-STIMULATORY 4-1BB LIGAND: SYNERGY WITH THE CD28 CO-STIMULATORY PATHWAY", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, DE, (1998), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1116 - 1121, XP000914703 [X] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4141(199803)28:03<1116::AID-IMMU1116>3.0.CO;2-A | [X] - GUINN B-A ET AL, "4-1BBL COOPERATES WITH B7-1 AND B7-2 IN CONVERTING A B CELL LYMPHOMA CELL LINE INTO A LONG-LASTING ANTITUMOR VACCINE", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (1999), vol. 162, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5003 - 5010, XP000887237 [X] 1-52 * the whole document * | [X] - TAKAHASHI C ET AL, "Cutting edge: 4-1BB is a bona fide CD8 T cell survival signal", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19990501), vol. 162, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5037 - 5040, XP002238984 [X] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - MELERO I ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies against the 4-1BB T-cell activation molecule eradicate established tumors", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (199706), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 682 - 685, XP002104261 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0697-682 | [Y] - BUBENIK J, "GENETICALLY ENGINEERED DENDRITIC CELL-BASED CANCER VACCINES (REVIEW)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, EDITORIAL ACADEMY OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY,, GR, (200103), vol. 18, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 475 - 478, XP001056627 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * | [Y] - MELIEF C J M ET AL, "STRATEGIES FOR IMMUNOTHERAPY OF CANCER", ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 75, ISSN 0065-2776, pages 235 - 282, XP001027072 [Y] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-2776(00)75006-1 | [PX] - WILCOX R A ET AL, "Provision of antigen and CD137 signaling breaks immunological ignorance, promoting regression of poorly immunogenic tumors", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200203), vol. 109, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 651 - 659, XP002238985 [PX] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200214184 | [PX] - DIEHL L ET AL, "In vivo triggering through 4-1BB enables Th-independent priming of CTL in the presence of an intact CD28 costimulatory pathway", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (20020415), vol. 168, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3755 - 3762, XP002238986 [PX] 1-52 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO0041508 (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) | [Y] - KIM ET AL, "State-of-the-art review:therapeutic potential of 4-1BB (CD137) as a regulator for effector CD8+T cells", J. HEMATOTHERAPY&STEM CELL RES., (200108), vol. 10, pages 441 - 449 | [Y] - SICA ET AL, "Biochemical and immunological characteristics of 4-1BB (CD137) receptor and ligand and potential application in cancer therapy", ARCHIVUM IMMUNOLOGIAE ET THERAPIAE EXPERIMENTALIS, (1999), vol. 47, pages 275 - 279 |