03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
09.11.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
22.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.03.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.12.2011 |
First examination report |
|
08.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
02.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|