EP1446867 - CONVERTER AND METHOD FOR GENERATION OF AN OVERLOAD SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2012/50] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Harald Sudetenstr. 41 76694 Forst / DE | 02 /
HILLENBRAND, Rainer Badener Str. 26 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 02802619.3 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002EP11173 | Priority number, date | DE2001154479 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154479 | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03041257 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446867 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446867 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/32, H02M7/5387 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M7/53875 (EP);
H02M1/0009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | H02M7/5387, H02M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Title | German: | UMRICHTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENERIERUNG EINES ÜBERSTROMSIGNALS | [2004/34] | English: | CONVERTER AND METHOD FOR GENERATION OF AN OVERLOAD SIGNAL | [2004/34] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ET PROCEDE DE GENERATION D'UN SIGNAL DE SURCHARGE DE COURANT | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/25] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 12.12.2012 | |
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | SE | 12.12.2012 | |
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | SE | 12.12.2012 | |
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5877950 (BONSIGNOUR ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 1 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19681189T | US5877950 |