EP1446447 - SILICA MATTING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Silicas Limited Bank Quay Warrington WA5 1AB / GB | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOREA-SWIFT, Gemma Ineos Silicas Ltd, Bank Quay, Warrington Cheshire WA5 1AB / GB | 02 /
GIBSON, Robin, Riyadh Newton Cottage Newton Lane Newton by Tattenhall Chester CH3 9AX / GB | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
MOREA-SWIFT, Gemma 8 Branden Drive Knutsford Cheshire WA16 8EJ / GB | ||
02 /
GIBSON, Robin, Riyadh Newton Cottage Newton Lane Newton by Tattenhall Chester CH3 9AX / GB | Representative(s) | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence, Highbank House Exchange Street Stockport, Cheshire SK3 0ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02803060.9 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002GB04697 | Priority number, date | GB20010027220 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0127220 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03042293 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446447 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446447 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/08, C09C1/30 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
C09C1/3072 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILICIUMDIOXID-MATTIERUNGSMITTEL | [2004/34] | English: | SILICA MATTING AGENTS | [2004/34] | French: | AGENTS DE MATITE SILICIEUX | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 30.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2006
Grace GmbH & Co. KG In der Hollerhecke 1 67545 Worms / DE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2006
Grace GmbH & Co. KG In der Hollerecke 1 67545 Worms / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2006
Grace GmbH & Co. KG In der Hollerecke 1 67545 Worms / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | 21.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.06.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2005 | CH | 06.04.2005 | CZ | 06.04.2005 | EE | 06.04.2005 | LI | 06.04.2005 | NL | 06.04.2005 | SK | 06.04.2005 | TR | 06.04.2005 | BG | 06.07.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | CY | 17.10.2005 | IE | 17.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | FI | 17.10.2009 | GB | 17.10.2009 | IT | 17.10.2009 | SE | 18.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | DE | 01.05.2010 | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
FI | 17.10.2009 | ||
GB | 17.10.2009 | ||
IT | 17.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
FI | 17.10.2009 | ||
GB | 17.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
FI | 17.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
FI | 17.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
EE | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
SK | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BG | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07166091 ; | [X]EP0541359 (CROSFIELD JOSEPH & SONS [GB]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9708250 (CROSFIELD JOSEPH & SONS [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 34, Database accession no. 1995-261494, XP002230795 & JPH07166091 A 19950627 (NIPPON SILICA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-11 * abstract * |