EP1451950 - MOBILE ROUTER SUPPORT FOR IPv6 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markki, Outi Elisa Pikkulinnunkuja 2A FIN-02660 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Kniveton, Timothy J. c/o Keilalahdentie 4 FIN-02150 Nokia Group / FI | 03 /
Malinen, Jari T. 655 S. Fair Oaks Avenue H-104 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Devarapalli, Vijay 2311 Gianera Street Santa Clara CA 94054 / US | 05 /
Perkins, Charles E. 12450 Blue Meadow Ct. Saratoga CA 95070 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
Markki, Outi Elisa Pikkulinnunkuja 2A FIN-02660 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
Malinen, Jari T. 655 S. Fair Oaks Avenue H-104 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | |||
04 /
Devarapalli, Vijay 2311 Gianera Street Santa Clara CA 94054 / US | |||
05 /
Perkins, Charles E. 12450 Blue Meadow Ct. Saratoga CA 95070 / US | |||
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Markki, Outi Elisa Pikkulinnunkuja 2A FIN-02660 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
Malinen, Jari T. 655 S. Fair Oaks Avenue H-104 Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | |||
04 /
Devarapalli, Vijay 2311 Gianera Street Santa Clara CA 94054 / US | |||
05 /
Perkins, Charles E. 12450 Blue Meadow Ct. Saratoga CA 95070 / US | |||
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
Markki, Outi Elisa Pikkulinnunkuja 2A FIN-02660 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
Kniveton, Timothy J. Suite 4 468 Tehama Street San Fransisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
03 /
Malinen, Jari T. 655 S. Fair Oaks Avenue H-104 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
04 /
Devarapalli, Vijay 2311 Gianera Street Santa Clara, CA 94054 / US | |||
05 /
Perkins, Charles E. 12450 Blue Meadow Ct. Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02803222.5 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US36607 | Priority number, date | US20010336221P | 14.11.2001 Original published format: US 336221 P | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043226 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451950 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451950 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W8/04, H04W80/04, H04W84/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/167 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
H04W84/005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/24] | H04W8/04 | ||
Former IPC [2004/36] | H04B7/24, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOBIL-ROUTER-UNTERSTÜTZUNG FÜR IPV6 | [2004/36] | English: | MOBILE ROUTER SUPPORT FOR IPv6 | [2004/36] | French: | SUPPORT DE ROUTEUR MOBILE POUR IPV6 | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | IE | 14.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | FR | 19.12.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 14.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 19.12.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OKAJIMA I ET AL, "Architecture and mobile IPv6 extensions supporting mobile networks in mobile communications", IEEE 54TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VTC FALL 2001. PROCEEDINGS 7-11 OCT. 2001 ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, USA; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], IEEE 54TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VTC FALL 2001. PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.01CH37211) IEEE PISCATA, (20011007), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-7005-0, pages 2533 - 2537, XP010562429 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * sections II-VI * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.957207 | [X] - THIERRY ERNST LUDOVIC BELLIER ALEXIS OLIVEREAU CASTELLUCCIA CLAUDE HONG-YON LACH MOTOROLA LABS AND INRIA PLANETE ET AL, "Mobile Networks Support in Mobile IPv6 (Prefix Scope Binding Updates); draft-ernst-mobileip-v6-network-02.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20010622), no. 2, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015012989 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * sections 1-4 * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US5781772 (WILKINSON III HUGH M [US], et al); | [Y]US5796740 (PERLMAN RADIA JOY [US], et al); | [Y]US6061650 (MALKIN GARY [US], et al); | [Y]US6061712 (TZENG HONG-YI [US]); | [Y]US6101543 (ALDEN KENNETH F [US], et al); | [Y]US6195705 (LEUNG KENT K [US]); | [Y]US6223172 (HUNTER VAN A [US], et al); | [Y]US6240089 (OKANOUE KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6256300 (AHMED WALID [US], et al); | [Y]US6269099 (BORELLA MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US6285680 (STEINKA BRADFORD R [US], et al); | [Y] - PERKINS C.E., BOUND J., THIRD IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, 1998 ISCC'98 PROCEEDINGS, (19980630), pages 493 - 497, XP010295114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCC.1998.702572 |