EP1448522 - GABUSECTIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIELL, Matthias Zehntenstrasse 1 65611 Brechen / DE | 02 /
KNAUF, Martin Bahnhofstrasse 5, Postfach 331 CH-6037 Root / CH | 03 /
TOTI, Luigi Frankfurter Strasse 5 65239 Hochheim / DE | 04 /
MARKUS-ERB, Astrid Sulzbacher Strasse 6 65835 Liederbach / DE | [2004/35] | Application number, filing date | 02803357.9 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002EP12420 | Priority number, date | DE2001156906 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156906 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043984 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448522 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448522 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/44 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C07D207/44 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GABUSECTIN-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2004/35] | English: | GABUSECTIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE OF THE SAME | [2004/35] | French: | DERIVES DE GABUSECTINE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2004/35] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.01.2009 | CZ | 28.01.2009 | DK | 28.01.2009 | EE | 28.01.2009 | FI | 28.01.2009 | IE | 28.01.2009 | IT | 28.01.2009 | NL | 28.01.2009 | SK | 28.01.2009 | TR | 28.01.2009 | BG | 28.04.2009 | SE | 28.04.2009 | GR | 29.04.2009 | ES | 09.05.2009 | PT | 29.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
IT | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
GR | 29.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
BG | 28.04.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SK | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CZ | 28.01.2009 | |
DK | 28.01.2009 | ||
EE | 28.01.2009 | ||
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 28.01.2009 | |
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
IE | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 28.01.2009 | |
FI | 28.01.2009 | ||
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 28.01.2009 | |
NL | 28.01.2009 | ||
SE | 28.04.2009 | ||
ES | 09.05.2009 | ||
PT | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 28.01.2009 | |
ES | 09.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0174772 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [PA]WO0246152 (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-21 * column W *; | [D]DE10060810 (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]); | [A] - ROYLES B J L, "Naturally Occuring Tetramic Acids: Structure, Isolation, and Synthesis", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1995), vol. 95, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 1981 - 2001, XP002206526 [A] 1-21 * figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00038a009 |