EP1436360 - METHOD FOR HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS IN A THREE-PHASE REACTOR IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST COMPRISING A GROUP VIII METAL SUPPORTED ON ZIRCONIA OR MIXED ZIRCONIA-ALUMINA OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states ENI S.p.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei, 1 Roma / IT | [2010/14] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Eni S.P.A. Piazzale Enrico Mattei, 1 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY-AUBERGER, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos, 23 ave. du Général Leclerc F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | 02 /
REVEL, Renaud Mons F-38200 Serpaize / FR | 03 /
TISSOT, Virginie 2 avenue du maréchal Foch F-92260 Fontenay Aux Roses / FR | 04 /
ENACHE, Dan Ion 40 Cefn Coed Avenue, Cyncoed Cardiff, CF23 6HG / GB | 05 /
ZENNARO, Roberto Calle Zugna Sant'Elena 12 IT-30132 Venezia / IT | 06 /
PEDERZANI, Giovanni Via Enrico Fermi 12/B IT-20097 S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | [2010/01] |
Former [2005/20] | 01 /
Roy-Auberger, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos, 23 ave. du Maréchal Leclerc F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | ||
02 /
REVEL, Renaud Mons F-38200 Serpaize / FR | |||
03 /
TISSOT, Virginie 2 avenue du maréchal Foch F-92260 Fontenay Aux Roses / FR | |||
04 /
ENACHE, Dan 40 Cefn Coed Avenue, Cyncoed Cardiff, CF23 6HG / GB | |||
05 /
ZENNARO, Roberto Calle Zugna Sant Elena 12 IT-30132 Venezia / IT | |||
06 /
PEDERZANI, Giovanni Via Enrico Fermi 12/B IT-20097 S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | |||
Former [2004/46] | 01 /
Roy-Auberger, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos, 23 ave. du Maréchal Leclerc F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | ||
02 /
REVEL, Renaud Mons F-38200 Serpaize / FR | |||
03 /
TISSOT, Virginie 6, rue Henri Martin F-92240 Malakoff / FR | |||
04 /
ENACHE, Dan 146 Colum Road, Cathays Cardiff, CF10 3EJ / GB | |||
05 /
ZENNARO, Roberto 53, Via Nicola Palmieri IT-201414 Milano / IT | |||
06 /
PEDERZANI, Giovanni Via Enrico Fermi 12/B IT-20097 S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | |||
Former [2004/31] | 01 /
Roy-Auberger, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos, 23 ave. du Maréchal Leclerc F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | ||
02 /
REVEL, Renaud 30, rue Desaix F-78800 Houilles / FR | |||
03 /
TISSOT, Virginie 6, rue Henri Martin F-92240 Malakoff / FR | |||
04 /
ENACHE, Dan 24, rue dz Docteur Zamenhof F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | |||
05 /
ZENNARO, Roberto 53, Via Nicola Palmieri IT-201414 Milano / IT | |||
06 /
PEDERZANI, Giovanni Via Enrico Fermi 12/B IT-20097 S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | |||
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Roy-Auberger, Magalie Résidence le Kerylos, 23 ave. du Maréchal Leclerc F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | ||
02 /
REVEL, Renaud 30, rue Desaix F-78800 Houilles / FR | |||
03 /
TISSOT, Virginie 6, rue Henri Martin F-92240 Malakoff / FR | |||
04 /
ENACHE, Dan 24, rue dz Docteur Zamenhof F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 02803430.4 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002FR03415 | Priority number, date | FR20010013138 | 11.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0113138 | [2004/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044126 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436360 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436360 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10G2/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C10G2/332 (EP);
C10G2/333 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, NL [2010/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOHLENWASSERSTOFFSYNTHESE IN EINEM DREIPHASENREAKTOR IN GEGENWART EINES KATALYSATORS, DER EIN METALL DER GRUPPE VIII AUF ZIRCONIUMOXID ODER ZIRCONIUMOXID-ALUMINIUMOXID-MISCHOXID GETRÄGERT ENTHÄLT | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD FOR HYDROCARBON SYNTHESIS IN A THREE-PHASE REACTOR IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST COMPRISING A GROUP VIII METAL SUPPORTED ON ZIRCONIA OR MIXED ZIRCONIA-ALUMINA OXIDE | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'HYDROCARBURES DANS UN REACTEUR TRIPHASIQUE EN PRESENCE D'UN CATALYSEUR COMPRENANT UN METAL DU GROUPE VIII SUPPORTE SUR ZIRCONE OU SUR OXYDE MIXTE ZIRCONE-ALUMINE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5958985 (HOEK AREND ET AL) [A] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1,6,8 * * column 3, line 9 - line 11 * * column 3, line 27 - line 30 * * column 4, line 37 - line 42 *; | [DA]EP0716883 (BASF AG) [DA] 1,2,4,5 * claims 1-6 * * column 3, line 12 - line 17 * * column 3, line 25 - line 31 *; | [A]US6180555 (DECKER SEBSASTIEN ET AL) [A] 1,4,5,8 * claims 1,3,7 * * column 4, line 41 - line 50 * * column 9, line 36 - line 39 *; | [A]EP0266727 (LONZA AG) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |