Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7119087 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2006 | B2 | US2005004128 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0203978 | 20.11.2002 | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5134755B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2013 | B2 | JP2005509681 | 14.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0203978 | 20.11.2002 | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002356251 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0203978 | 20.11.2002 | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1451197 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2007 | B1 | EP1451197 | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0203978 | 20.11.2002 | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60219946T | 10.01.2008 | T2 | DE60219946D1 | 14.06.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0203978 | 20.11.2002 | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03044024 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE361306T | 15.05.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2832714 | 16.07.2004 | B1 | FR2832714 | 30.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0115152 | 23.11.2001 |