EP1458405 - USE OF FK506 AND ANALOGUES FOR TREATING ALLERGIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sucampo AG Graben 5 6300 Zug / CH | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ryuji 11025 Stanmore Drive, Potomac Montgomery, MD 20854 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02803544.2 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002JP12096 | Priority number, date | US20010331722P | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 331722 P | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043650 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458405 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/13, A61K31/436, A61P11/06, A61P27/14 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON FK506 UND ANALOGA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALLERGISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2004/39] | English: | USE OF FK506 AND ANALOGUES FOR TREATING ALLERGIC DISEASES | [2004/39] | French: | UTILISATION DE FK506 ET D'ANALOGUES DE CELUI-CI POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES ALLERGIQUES | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 14.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4215199 (HAERRI EUGEN [CH], et al) [XD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DX]US4288431 (TRABER RENE P, et al) [DX] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XD]US4388307 (CAVANAK THOMAS [CH]) [XD] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XD]WO9219278 (UNIV KURUME [JP]) [XD] 1-37 * page 1, line 20 - line 29 * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * figure I * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 25 * * example 2 * * claims 1-9 *; | [XD]WO9409010 (SANDOZ AG [AT], et al) [XD] 1-21,28-30,37 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [XD]US5912253 (COTTENS SYLVAIN [CH], et al) [XD] 1-18 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 35 *; | [X] - "Protopic (tacrolimus)", FUJISAWA, URL: http://www.protopic.com/img/protopic_pi.pdf, (20030205), XP002230797 [X] 1-23,26,28-32,35,37 * the whole document * |