EP1456303 - METHOD FOR ADHESIVELY JOINING WOOD PRODUCT SURFACES AND A LAMINATED WOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/38] | TWO-PART POLYURETHANE ADHESIVES FOR STRUCTURAL FINGER JOINTS AND METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2008/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashland Licensing and Intellectual Property LLC 5200 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states ASHLAND INC. P.O. Box 2219 Columbus, OH 43216 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Gang-Fung 9740 Concord Road Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
WALSWORTH, Gary 4647 Bridle Path Lane Dublin, Oh 43017 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Bülle, Jan, et al Patentanwälte Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02803621.8 | 15.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US36539 | Priority number, date | US20010988236 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: US 988236 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044094 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456303 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456303 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C09J5/00, B32B21/00, C08G18/10 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B21/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/302 (EP,US);
C09J175/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2004/38] | C08L101/00, C09J5/00, B32B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/17] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERKLEBEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN EINES HOLZPRODUKTS UND EIN LAMINIERTES HOLZPRODUKT | [2008/33] | English: | METHOD FOR ADHESIVELY JOINING WOOD PRODUCT SURFACES AND A LAMINATED WOOD PRODUCT | [2008/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE COLLAGE DE SURFACES D'UN PRODUIT EN BOIS ET UN PRODUIT EN BOIS LAMINÉ | [2008/33] |
Former [2004/38] | POLYURETHAN-ZWEIKOMPONENTENKLEBER FÜR ZINKENFUGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2004/38] | TWO-PART POLYURETHANE ADHESIVES FOR STRUCTURAL FINGER JOINTS AND METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2004/38] | ADHESIFS POLYURETHANNES BICOMPOSANTS UTILISES POUR DES ASSEMBLAGES STRUCTURELS A ENTURES MULTIPLES ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2009 | BE | 22.04.2009 | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | IT | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | FI | 15.11.2009 | IE | 15.11.2009 | LU | 15.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | DK | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
FI | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
FI | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
FI | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
FI | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
FI | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 02.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5723534 (MURRAY PAT L [US]) [X] 1-13,20,21 * claims 1-35 *; | [A]US5730824 (SPENCE ORVILLE [US], et al) [A] 15-19* claim 1 * | International search | [X]US4433095 (HOMBACH RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [Y]US4663377 (HOMBACH RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [Y]US5200489 (JACOBS PATRICIA B [US], et al); | [X]US5252696 (LAAS HANS J [DE], et al); | [X]US5449559 (FURLAN WAYNE R [US], et al); | [Y]US5643983 (LEE SHANG [US]); | [X]US5717031 (DEGEN JAMES B [US], et al); | [Y]US6225398 (BOUDREAUX CHASE J [US], et al); | [X]US6280561 (MCINNIS EDWIN LEE [US], et al); | [YP]US6420478 (IRLE CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) |