EP1451104 - CALCIUM METASILICATES AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.M. Huber Corporation 3100 Cumberland Boulevard, Suite 600 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states J.M. Huber Corporation 3100 Cumberland Boulevard Suite 600 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states J.M. HUBER CORPORATION 333 Thornall Street Edison, NJ 08837-2220 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITHIAM, Michael, C. 25 Ketcham Court Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 02 /
CONLEY, Donald, P. 73 Groff Farm Lane Conowingo, MD 21918 / US | 03 /
YANNUL, Edward, T. 5608 San Tropez Drive Salida, California 95368 / US | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
WITHIAM, Michael, C. 25 Ketcham Court Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | ||
02 /
CONLEY, Donald, P. 73 Groff Farm Lane Conowingo, MD 21918 / US | |||
03 /
YANNUL, Edward, T. 61 Steelman Drive Conowingo, MD 21918 / US | Representative(s) | Doyle, Elspeth Grace, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Doyle, Elspeth Grace, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/11] | D'Arcy, Julia, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | D'Arcy, Julia, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02804083.0 | 26.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US38193 | Priority number, date | US20010333899P | 28.11.2001 Original published format: US 333899 P | US20020156890 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: US 156890 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045844 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451104 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451104 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, A23L1/059, A61K8/25, A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/14, C01B33/26, C01B33/24, C05D3/04, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10 | [2012/41] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2004/36] | C01B33/26, A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | CALCIUMMETASILIKATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/36] | English: | CALCIUM METASILICATES AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2004/36] | French: | METASILICATES DE CALCIUM ET LEURS PROCEDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2012/41] |
Former [2004/36] | METASILICATES DE CALCIUM ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | LU | 26.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | EE | 13.03.2013 | |
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BG | 13.06.2013 | |
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BG | 13.06.2013 | |
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BG | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3967974 (OHNEMULLER WALTER, et al) [X] 19-25 * column 3, line 31 - line 41 *; | [X]SU929555 (INST OBSCHEI I NEOORGANICHESKO [SU]) [X] 19-23 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5813684 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]EP0621771 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-28* page 2, line 17 - line 47 *; | [A]EP1145711 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [A] 1-28 * page 19; example 2; claims 1-12 * | International search | [X]US3967974 (OHNEMULLER WALTER, et al); | [A]US5032552 (NONAMI TOHRU [JP], et al); | [X]US5393472 (SHAW JOHN D [US]) | by applicant | US3967974 | US5393472 |