EP1455890 - TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND RESPIRATORY DISEASE BY MEANS OF ELECTRICAL NEURO-RECEPTIVE WAVEFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurosignal Technologies, Inc 539 Oliver Ross Drive NW Albuquerque NM 87121 / US | [2008/10] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Science Medicus, Inc. 4790 Caughlin Parkway No. 525 Reno, NV 89509 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULER, Eleanor 2201 Spruce Needle Road Rio Rancho, NM 87124 / US | 02 /
LEE, Claude, K. 4870 East Creek Ridge Trail Reno, NV 89509 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02804084.8 | 25.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US38194 | Priority number, date | US20010995194 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: US 995194 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03045496 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455890 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/3601 (EP,US);
A61N1/18 (KR);
A61N1/32 (KR);
A61N1/36031 (EP,US);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61N1/37252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA UND ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN DURCH ELEKTRISCHE NEUROREZEPTIVE WELLENFORMEN | [2004/38] | English: | TREATMENT OF ASTHMA AND RESPIRATORY DISEASE BY MEANS OF ELECTRICAL NEURO-RECEPTIVE WAVEFORMS | [2004/38] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME ET DE MALADIE RESPIRATOIRE AU MOYEN DE FORMES D'ONDES ELECTRIQUES A RECEPTION NEURONALE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 11.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2006 | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0155815 (BIO MEDICAL RES LTD [IE]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * figure 11A *; | [X]US4699143 (DUFRESNE JOEL R [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4832033 (MAHER DANIEL V [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0391428 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP], et al) [X] 5* the whole document *; | [X]CH686557 (HOSPITECH PHYSICOM CLINICHEM G [AT]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 18 * * column 8, lines 19-62 *; | [X]EP0860178 (SIRE S R L [IT]) [X] 5-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4598713 (HANSJUERGENS ACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]US5891182 (FLEMING JANET E [US]); | [A]US6198970 (FREED MARCY L [US], et al) |