Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004248754 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | EP0213127 | 22.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005514467 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | EP0213127 | 22.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002365628 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | EP0213127 | 22.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1451284 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2006 | B1 | EP1451284 | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | EP0213127 | 22.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50206700D1 | 08.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50206700 | 22.11.2002 | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | EP0213127 | 22.11.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03048290 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE325182T | 15.06.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10159388 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2260519T | 01.11.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10159388 | 04.12.2001 |