EP1487734 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL MOBILE PLATFORM FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF RAILWAY CARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricci, Francesco 8, Via Oliveto 52040 Loro Ciuffenna (Arezzo) / IT | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Bardini, Marco Luigi Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Bardini, Marco Luigi c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 02804335.4 | 03.12.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002IT00755 | Priority number, date | IT2001FI00096U | 04.12.2001 Original published format: IT FI20010096 U | [2004/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048024 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487734 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B66F11/04, B61K11/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B66F11/04 (EP);
B61K11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | 24.09.2004 | LT | 24.09.2004 | LV | 24.09.2004 | MK | 24.09.2004 | RO | 24.09.2004 | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONALE MOBILE PLATTFORM FÜR DIE INSTANDHALTUNG VON EISENBAHNWAGEN | [2004/52] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL MOBILE PLATFORM FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF RAILWAY CARS | [2004/52] | French: | PLATE-FORME MOBILE MULTIFONCTIONS DESTINEE A L'ENTRETIEN DES WAGONS DE CHEMIN DE FER | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2002 | Translation filed | 24.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | 24.09.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.09.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5685392 (ALTENDORF CHARLES ET AL) [X] 1 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 18; figures 1-9 * [A] 2-4,6,7,10-12; | [A]US5423396 (FAHRION OTMAR) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3709322 (MITCHELL M) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5671823 (OAKES KEITH L) [A] 1,2,10 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-9 * |