EP1510236 - METHOD FOR TRAINING MOUNTAIN SKIERS AND SNOWBOARDERS (VARIANTS) AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manuilov, Mikhail Valentinovich ul. Svobody, 6/3-19 Moscow, 123362 / RU | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Bucher, Ralf Christian Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Pfarrer-Sickinger-Weg 122 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Bucher, Ralf Christian Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Alte Landstrasse 23 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Bucher, Ralf Christian Arth, Bucher & Kollegen Patentanwälte Alte Landstrasse 23 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Bucher, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. (Univ.) Innovations- und Gründerzentrum Biotechnology (IZB), Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Martinsried / DE | Application number, filing date | 02804369.3 | 03.12.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002RU00516 | Priority number, date | RU20010132657 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: RU 2001132657 | [2005/09] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047704 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510236 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510236 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/18, A63B69/00, A63B24/00 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A63B24/00 (EP);
A63F13/245 (EP,US);
A63B69/18 (EP);
A63B71/0622 (EP,US);
A63F13/428 (EP);
A63F13/54 (EP);
A63F13/57 (EP);
A63F13/807 (EP,US);
G09B19/0038 (EP);
A63B2220/16 (EP,US);
A63B2220/833 (EP);
A63F2300/1062 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | A63B69/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | TRAININGSVERFAHREN FÜR ABFAHRTSSKILÄUFER UND SNOWBOARDERS (VARIANTEN) UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2005/09] | English: | METHOD FOR TRAINING MOUNTAIN SKIERS AND SNOWBOARDERS (VARIANTS) AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2005/09] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT DE SKIEURS ALPINS ET DE SURFEURS (VARIANTES) ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2004 | Translation filed | 18.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.08.2004 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | 18.08.2004 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.2004 | M02   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | BE | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IT | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | ES | 15.09.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CY | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CY | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | |
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 15.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000157656 ; | [X]US3791645 (STELMA N) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 6 - line 21 * * column 4, line 59 - line 64 ** Drawings *; | [XY]US5895340 (KELLER MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * column 2, line 7 - line 19 * * column 2, line 30 - line 40 * * column 4, line 10 - line 35 * * column 7, line 4 - line 16 * * claims 1,10,14,15 * * figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 2,3,6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000157656 A 20000613 (KATSUMI HIROSHI) [Y] 2,3,6 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US4906192 (SMITHARD MICHAEL A [GB], et al); | [A]DE4002223 (FOERST REINER [DE]); | [A]DE19521619 (FOERST REINER [DE]); | [A]EP0792667 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US5713794 (SHIMOJIMA HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2000157656 (KATSUMI HIROSHI) |