EP1456527 - DEVICE FOR THE TRANSLATION OF A DISPLACEMENT OF AN ACTUATOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜRZ, Willibald Lindenweg 3 93188 Pielenhofen / DE | [2004/38] | Application number, filing date | 02804848.6 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002DE04465 | Priority number, date | DE2001162045 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162045 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03052261 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456527 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456527 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M59/46, F02M61/16 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
F02M61/167 (EP,US);
F02M51/0603 (EP,US);
F02M2200/704 (EP,US);
F02M2200/705 (EP,US);
F02M2200/707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERSETZEN EINER AUSLENKUNG EINES AKTORS, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN EINSPRITZVENTIL | [2004/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE TRANSLATION OF A DISPLACEMENT OF AN ACTUATOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR AN INJECTION VALVE | [2004/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSLATER UNE DEVIATION D'UN ACTIONNEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19950760 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [DXY]EP1111230 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [Y]DE10002270 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [PY]WO0196733 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PY] 1 * abstract *; | [PAD]DE10046323 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PAD] 1* the whole document * |