EP1463513 - STABILIZED BRIVUDINE TOPICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menarini Ricerche S.p.A. Via Tito Speri, 10 00040 Pomezia / IT | For all designated states BERLIN-CHEMIE Aktiengesellschaft Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNITTKER, Christian Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KEIPERT, Sigrid Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | 03 /
GRÖGER, Karsten Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SCHMITZ, Reinhard Glienicker Weg 125 12489 Berlin / DE | 05 /
MAGGI, Carlo, Alberto Via Tito Speri, 10 I-00040 Pomezia (RM) / IT | 06 /
MANZINI, Stefano Via Tito Speri, 10 I-00040 Pomezia (RM) / IT | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS Srl Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02804870.0 | 04.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002EP13714 | Priority number, date | DE20011062593 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162593 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051375 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463513 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463513 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7072, A61K47/08, A61K47/10, A61K47/12 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K47/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE TOPISCHE BRIVUDIN-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2004/41] | English: | STABILIZED BRIVUDINE TOPICAL FORMULATIONS | [2004/41] | French: | PREPARATIONS TOPIQUES STABILISEES DE BRIVUDINE | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 14.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0755675 (OREAL [FR]) [XD] 1-14 * page 4, line 31 - line 32 * * page 5, line 55 - line 57 *; | [Y]DE19956601 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 20 *; | [A]WO9810768 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [Y] - FREEMAN D J ET AL, "Preclinical assessment of topical treatments of herpes simplex virus infection: 5% (E)-5-(2-bromovinyl)-2'-deoxyuridine cream.", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH. NETHERLANDS JUN 1985, (198506), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 169 - 177, XP008015919 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-3542(85)90049-X |