EP1455636 - LIP AND CHEEK EXPANDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORVATH, Domonkos Banhhofstrasse 24 79798 Jestetten / DE | 02 /
LUTZ, Felix DI . . / DE | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02804903.9 | 16.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002EP14342 | Priority number, date | CH20050200123 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: CH 20012305 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051185 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455636 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455636 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/24, A61C5/14 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61C5/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | LIPPEN-UND WANGENEXPANDER | [2004/38] | English: | LIP AND CHEEK EXPANDER | [2004/38] | French: | EXTENSEUR DE LEVRES ET DE JOUES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IE | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | ES | 19.07.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | LU | 16.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
LU | 16.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 08.04.2009 | |
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | SI | 08.04.2009 | |
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 08.04.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE239700 (ROSENTHAL PIERRE) [A] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE422782 (HERMANN GERNERT) [A] 1-8,11-13,17,26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE512266 (MAX BERGMANN DR) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DY]DE8323817U (MIHAJLOVIC DUSAN) [DY] 1-18,26 * page 6, lines 24-29 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 29 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4889490 (JENKINSON JEFFREY A [US]) [A] 1,2,11-13 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 23 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4944313 (KATZ SEYMOUR [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11,22,24,25 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 51 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5199872 (LEAL FRANCISCO G B [BR]) [A] 1,10,11,22,24,25 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 66 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9834559 (HORVATH DOMONOKOS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18,26 * page 5, lines 1-21 * * page 6, lines 4-12 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 9 * * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 28 * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 8 * * figures 1-15 *; | [A]EP0988834 (SCHAFRAT B [NL]) [A] 1,2,10,14-16 * column 4, lines 6-33 * * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE8323817U |