Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005015372 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0205244 | 05.12.2002 | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005528671 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | IB0205244 | 05.12.2002 | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002366408 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2003 | A8 | AU2002366408 | 30.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0205244 | 05.12.2002 | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1459181 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IB0205244 | 05.12.2002 | EP02804986 | 05.12.2002 | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03052589 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2004 | A3 | WO03052589 | 26.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1602469 | 30.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP01204884 | 14.12.2001 |