EP1459181 - METHOD FOR DATA PROCESSING IN A MULTI-PROCESSOR DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A CORRESPONDING DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN EIJNDHOVEN, Josephus, T., J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
POL, Evert, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RUTTEN, Martijn, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/39] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02804986.4 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002IB05244 | Priority number, date | EP20010204884 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01204884 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03052589 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1459181 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/30087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM MEHRPROZESSOR-SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/39] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA PROCESSING IN A MULTI-PROCESSOR DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A CORRESPONDING DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2004/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES MULTIPROCESSEUR ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES CORRESPONDANT | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/16] | 10.12.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0381325 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 5 - line 28 * * column 3, line 1 - line 20 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 33 *; | [X]US5408629 (TSUCHIVA KENICHI [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 21 - line 24 * * column 3, line 37 - line 56 * * column 4, line 37 - line 47 * * column 6, line 35 - line 41 * * column 11, line 44 - line 51 * * column 12, line 12 - line 35 *; | [A]US6289421 (ALI SYED S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 6 - line 22 * * column 2, line 26 - line 65 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 32 - line 38 *; | [A] - SANTOLINE L L ET AL, "MULTIPROCESSOR SHARED-MEMORY INFORMATION EXCHANGE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19890201), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 626 - 633, XP000112755 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.34514 |