EP1455894 - DEVICE FOR MUSCLE STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioness Neuromodulation Ltd 19 Hacharoshet Street 43654 Raanana / IL | [2008/45] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states N.E.S.S. Neuromuscular Electrical Stimulation Systems Ltd. 19 Ha'haroshet Street, P.O. Box 2500, Industrial Zone Ra'anana 43654 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAR, Amit P.O. Box 2500 43654 Ra'anana / IL | 02 /
NATHAN, Roger, H. P.O. Box 2500 43654 Ra'anana / IL | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02805001.1 | 18.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002IL01020 | Priority number, date | US20010340277P | 18.12.2001 Original published format: US 340277 P | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03051453 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455894 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, A61N1/36 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/0472 (EP,US);
A61N1/0476 (EP,US);
A61N1/0484 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STIMULIERUNG VON MUSKELN | [2004/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR MUSCLE STIMULATION | [2004/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION MUSCULAIRE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 28.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2590151 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 37 - page 10, line 28 ** page 13, line 17 - page 14, line 25 *; | [XY]EP0506398 (UNIV BEN GURION [IL]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 32 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 53 * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]WO9510323 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al) [Y] 7,8 * page 2, line 21 - page 5, line 8 * * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 25 - page 13, line 10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5776171 (PECKHAM PAUL HUNTER [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 36 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 43 * * column 7, line 4 - column 17, line 49 *; | [A]US5904712 (AXELGAARD JENS [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6052624 (MANN CARLA M [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 4,5A,6A,6B * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 8 * * column 7, line 38 - column 10, line 64 * * column 12, line 51 - column 15, line 14 * | International search | [X]US5643332 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA]); | [X]US5628722 (SOLOMONOW MOSHE [US], et al); | [X]US6064912 (KENNEY JOHN P [US]) |