19.02.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
29.01.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.05.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2007 |
First examination report |
|
07.07.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
22.09.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
20.08.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
10.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|