EP1463454 - BLOOD FLOW REESTABLISHMENT DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ekos Corporation Suite 101, 22030 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Ekos Corporation Suite 101, 22030 20th Avenue S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILCOX, Robert, L. 9213 NE 151st Street Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 02 /
HANSMANN, Douglas, R. 5008 Rockaway Beach Road NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 03 /
KARP, Floyd, B. 1034 NE 91st Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 04 /
VOLZ, Kim, R. 27015 NE Dorothy Street Duvall, WA 98018 / US | 05 /
PESKIN, Natalya 14105 NE 72nd Place Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 06 /
RODRIGUEZ, Oscar 14250 NW 18 Place Pembroke Pines, Florida 33028 / US | 07 /
ABRAHAMSON, Tim 8027 South 134th Street Seattle, Washington 98178 / US | 08 /
BENNETT, Frederick J. 130 NE Creekway 23 Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | 09 /
GENSTLER, Curtis 17221 Butler Road Snohomoish, Washington 98290 / US | 10 /
BARRERE, WM. Gerrit 16614 - 32nd Avnue NE Lake Forrest Park, Washington 98155 / US | 11 /
KEILMAN, George 20018 163rd Avenue NE Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | 12 /
WILSON, Richard R. 11035 - 26th Avenue SW Seattle, Washington 98146 / US | 13 /
THOMPSON, Perry Todd 11901 93rd Avenue NE 207 Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/41] | 01 /
WILCOX, Robert, L. 9213 NE 151st Street Bothell, WA 98011 / US | ||
02 /
HANSMANN, Douglas, R. 5008 Rockaway Beach Road NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | |||
03 /
KARP, Floyd, B. 1034 NE 91st Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | |||
04 /
VOLZ, Kim, R. 27015 NE Dorothy Street Duvall, WA 98018 / US | |||
05 /
PESKIN, Natalya 14105 NE 72nd Place Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
06 /
RODRIGUEZ, Oscar 14250 NW 18 Place Pembroke Pines, Florida 33028 / US | |||
07 /
ABRAHAMSON, Tim 8027 South 134th Street Seattle, Washington 98178 / US | |||
08 /
BENNETT, Frederick J. 130 NE Creekway #23 Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | |||
09 /
GENSTLER, Curtis 17221 Butler Road Snohomoish, Washington 98290 / US | |||
10 /
BARRERE, WM. Gerrit 16614 - 32nd Avnue NE Lake Forrest Park, Washington 98155 / US | |||
11 /
KEILMAN, George 20018 163rd Avenue NE Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | |||
12 /
WILSON, Richard R. 11035 - 26th Avenue SW Seattle, Washington 98146 / US | |||
13 /
THOMPSON, Perry Todd 11901 93rd Avenue NE #207 Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | Representative(s) | Hector, Annabel Mary D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Hector, Annabel Mary D Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02805204.1 | 16.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002US40466 | Priority number, date | US20010341430P | 14.12.2001 Original published format: US 341430 P | US20020347350P | 10.01.2002 Original published format: US 347350 P | US20020369453P | 02.04.2002 Original published format: US 369453 P | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051208 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463454 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/22012 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00101 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22021 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22082 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22084 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER BLUTSTROMWIEDERHERSTELLUNG | [2004/41] | English: | BLOOD FLOW REESTABLISHMENT DETERMINATION | [2004/41] | French: | DETERMINATION DU RETABLISSEMENT DU FLUX SANGUIN | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 18.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9207622 (BSD MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 15,25* the whole document *; | [A]WO9811826 (HEART RHYTHM TECH INC [US]) [A] 15,25 * abstract * * page 18, lines 17-24 *; | [XA]WO0000095 (EKOS CORP [US]) [X] 25 * the whole document * [A] 15-17,21; | [A]WO0113357 (EKOS CORP [US]) [A] 15-17,25 * abstract * * page 25, line 21 - page 26, line 4 * * page 27, line 9 - page 28, line 16 * * page 29, line 4 - page 32, line 3 *; | [A]WO0187174 (ATRIONIX INC [US]) [A] 15-17,21,25 * abstract * * page 59, lines 7-16 * * page 61, line 5 - page 62, line 6 * | by applicant | US4821740 | US4953565 | US5007438 | US5431663 | US5474531 | US5628728 | US6001069 | US6135976 | USRE36939E | US6176842 |