Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1485915
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.08.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
03.05.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.01.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
17.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
29.10.2004 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
27.10.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|