EP1485915 - RECORD CARRIER AND SCANNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIJBOER, Jakob, G. Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
STEK, Aalbert Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SCHEP, Cornelis, M. Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02805435.1 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002IB05225 | Priority number, date | EP20010205133 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01205133 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03054864 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485915 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/32, G11B19/12 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G11B2020/1225 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1294 (EP,US);
G11B2220/215 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER UND SCAN-EINRICHTUNG | [2004/51] | English: | RECORD CARRIER AND SCANNING DEVICE | [2004/51] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |