EP1457256 - ADSORBENT FOR PHOSPHORIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muromachi Chemicals Inc. 1-38-5 Shinkatsudachimachi Ohmuta-shi Fukoka / JP | For all designated states Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35 Higashisotoboricho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Muromachi Chemicals Inc. 1-38-5 Shinkatsudachimachi Ohmuta-shi, Fukoka / JP | ||
For all designated states Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35 Higashisotoboricho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | |||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Muromachi Chemical Co., Ltd 1-38-5 Shinkatsudachimachi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0895 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANO, H., c/o Muromachi Chemical Co., Ltd 1-38-5, Shinkatsudachimachi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0895 / JP | 02 /
IENAKA, T., c/o Muromachi Chemical Co., Ltd 1-38-5, Shinkatsudachimachi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0895 / JP | 03 /
NODA, H., c/o Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35, Higashisotoboricho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 04 /
TOMOTO, A., c/o Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35, Higashisotoboricho, Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8631 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02805475.7 | 18.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002JP13248 | Priority number, date | JP20010388788 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001388788 | [2004/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053565 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457256 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/24, A61K31/731, A61K31/732, A61K31/734, A61P3/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/24 (KR);
A61K31/731 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/732 (EP,US);
A61K31/734 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADSORPTIONSMITTEL FÜR PHOSPHORSÄURE | [2004/38] | English: | ADSORBENT FOR PHOSPHORIC ACID | [2004/38] | French: | ADSORBANT POUR L'ACIDE PHOSPHORIQUE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | Translation filed | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 18.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06277504 (EBARA INFILCO, et al); | [X]JPH0739754 (EBARA RES CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH05155776 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC); | [A]JPH06157324 (YAMAGUCHI TATSUAKI); | [A]US6174442 (GEISSER PETER [CH], et al); | [A]US5514281 (BOOS KARL-SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) |