Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.08.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
23.02.2005 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
23.02.2005 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
07.01.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
27.08.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
24.08.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.08.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.07.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.02.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.07.2003 | PCT data prior to European publication |