EP1455673 - SYSTEM FOR EXCITATION LEADLESS MINIATURE MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calypso Medical Technologies, INC. Suite 1550, 2101 Fourth Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2006/10] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Calypso Medical Technologies, Inc. Suite 1550, 2101 Fourth Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMMER, Steven C. 12810 NE 32nd Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02805662.0 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US41097 | Priority number, date | US20010027675 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: US 27675 | US20020044056 | 11.01.2002 Original published format: US 44056 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03053270 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455673 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455673 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
G01B7/00 (US);
G01B7/003 (EP);
A61B2017/00411 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3958 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3975 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1051 (EP,US);
A61N5/1049 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANREGUNG EINES LEITUNGSLOSEN MINIATUR-MARKERS | [2004/38] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EXCITATION LEADLESS MINIATURE MARKER | [2004/38] | French: | SYSTEME POUR MARQUEUR D'EXCITATION MINIATURE SANS BROCHE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | CZ | 08.03.2006 | EE | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | FR | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | SI | 08.03.2006 | SK | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | BG | 08.06.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
EE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SK | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
SI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3752960 (WALTON C) [A] 1,21,32,37,67,77,81,91* column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US5645065 (SHAPIRO ALAN R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,21,32,37,42,49,67,77,81,91 * column 10, line 9 - line 34; figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO9830166 (FABIAN CARL E [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10,12,67,72,81 * page 8, line 10 - line 17; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9958065 (KRAG DAVID N [US]) [A] 1,21,32,37,67,77,81,91 * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 9; figures 3A,3B *; | [XA]US6198963 (HAIM SHLOMO BEN [IL], et al) [X] 21,24-29,32,34,35,37,40-42,44-46 * column 9, line 35 - line 37 * * column 10, line 22 - line 41 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 15; figures 4,8A * [A] 1,63,67,77,81,91 |