EP1459271 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSET TRACKING WITH ORGANIZATION-PROPERTY-INDIVIDUAL MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centric Media, Inc. Suite 101, 1475 Powell Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTON, J., R., III 65 Sea View Avenue Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
RAPOSO, Paul 2 Townsend Street 1-209 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
ROMAN, Kendyl, A. 730 Bantry Court Sunnyvale, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
HOFFMAN, David 70 Heath Street West 209 Toronto, Ontario M4V 1T4 / CA | 05 /
VON CONTA, Rodrigo 2435 Potomac Street Oakland, CA 94602 / US | 06 /
HOLMES, Maria 2525 Amber Lane Flowermound, Texas 75028 / US | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
ORTON, J., R., III 65 Sea View Avenue Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | ||
02 /
RAPOSO, Paul 2 Townsend Street 1-209 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
03 /
ROMAN, Kendyl, A. 730 Bantry Court Sunnyvale, CA 94107 / US | |||
04 /
HOFFMAN, David 70 Heath Street West 209 Toronto, Ontario M4V 1T4 / CA | |||
05 /
VON CONTA, Rodrigo 2435 Potomac Street Oakland, CA 94602 / US | |||
06 /
HOLMES, Maria 2828 Sunny Bank Lane Hayward, CA 94541 / US | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Holt, Daniel Richard Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02806223.0 | 26.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US41398 | Priority number, date | US20010344740P | 26.12.2001 Original published format: US 344740 P | US20020328350 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 328350 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03058397 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1459271 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G06F17/60 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/28 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
Y10S707/99936 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | G08B13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | 14.07.2004 | LT | 14.07.2004 | LV | 14.07.2004 | MK | 14.07.2004 | RO | 14.07.2004 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KAPITALVERFOLGUNG MIT EINEM ORGANISATIONS-EIGENSCHAFTS-INDIVIDUUM-MODELL | [2004/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSET TRACKING WITH ORGANIZATION-PROPERTY-INDIVIDUAL MODEL | [2004/39] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SUIVI D'ACTIFS AU MOYEN D'UN MODELE ORGANISATION-BIEN-INDIVIDU | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001053981 (WYSSEN HANS [CH]) [X] 1-19 * abstract ** paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * | International search | [A]US4271352 (THOMAS LON G); | [A]US5732401 (CONWAY DAVID W [US]); | [A]US5809481 (BARON DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US5962834 (MARKMAN HERBERT L [US]); | [A]US6025780 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al); | [X]US6259367 (KLEIN ELLIOT S [US]) |