EP1470640 - AN ACTIVE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavazzoni, Roberto Via Fattori, 47 42044 Gualtieri / IT | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Baroni, Matteo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Baroni, Matteo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/44] | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02806663.7 | 23.12.2002 | [2004/44] | WO2002IT00820 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI00161 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020161 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03065578 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470640 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/12 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H03H11/1252 (EP,US);
H03H11/1234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES FILTER | [2004/44] | English: | AN ACTIVE FILTER | [2004/44] | French: | FILTRE ACTIF | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - SOLIMAN A M, ISMAIL M, "A UNIVERSAL VARIABLE PHASE 3-PORT VCVS AND ITS APPLICATION IN TWO-INTEGRATOR LOOP FILTERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. HOUSTON, APRIL 28 - 30, 1980., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19800428), vol. 1, pages 83 - 86, XP002240261 [A] 1,3-13,17,18,21,22,24,28 * the whole document * |