EP1549484 - METHOD AND MOLD FOR MAKING OPHTHALMIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSELL, Scott, F. 1321 Crystal Sands Drive Jacksonville, FL 32218 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02807717.0 | 28.08.2002 | [2005/27] | WO2002US27487 | Priority number, date | US20020228719 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: US 228719 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020182 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549484 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B29D11/0048 (EP,US);
B29C33/3842 (EP,US);
B29C33/40 (EP,US);
B29C33/44 (EP,US);
B29C45/2673 (EP,US);
B29D11/00038 (EP);
B29D11/00125 (US);
B29C2045/2679 (EP,US);
B29L2011/0041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2005/50] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FORMWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPHTHALMISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2005/27] | English: | METHOD AND MOLD FOR MAKING OPHTHALMIC DEVICES | [2005/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOULE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS OPHTALMIQUES | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3807682 (KNUTSON M, et al) [A] 12* figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0857565 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [X] 12 * figures 6-10 * | International search | [X]US4091057 (WEBER HERMANN P); | [X]US5982565 (NOMURA YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5750060 (MAUS STEVEN M [US], et al); | [Y]US5702735 (MARTIN WALLACE ANTHONY [US], et al) |