EP1551320 - ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Aesculap AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Ulrich Skiliftweg 11a 8374 Oberwangen / CH | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Jörg Kolpingweg 21 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
KOZAK, JEFFREY 7401 SOUTH MAIN STREET HOUSTON, TX 77030-4509 / US | 04 /
BEISSE, RUDOLF GRANDLÄCKER 8 82418 SEEHAUSEN / DE | 05 /
POTULSKI, MICHAEL GREUTWEG 18 82441 OHLSTADT / DE | [2006/22] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
KRAMER, Ulrich Königstrasse 59 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHUMACHER, Jörg Kolpingweg 21 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | |||
03 /
KOZAK, JEFFREY 7401 SOUTH MAIN STREET HOUSTON, TX 77030-4509 / US | |||
04 /
BEISSE, RUDOLF GRANDLÄCKER 8 82418 SEEHAUSEN / DE | |||
05 /
POTULSKI, MICHAEL GREUTWEG 18 82441 OHLSTADT / DE | Representative(s) | Boehme, Ulrich HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Böhme, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02807751.9 | 04.09.2002 | WO2002EP09878 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021901 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551320 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551320 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/7041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [2005/49] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHE FIXATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/28] | English: | ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION DEVICE | [2005/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ORTHOPEDIQUE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 13.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0384001 (ACROMED CORP [US]) [DA] 1-45 * abstract *; | [A]US5330473 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-45* abstract *; | [A]US5611800 (DAVIS BRADFORD D [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * abstract * | by applicant | US5024213 | US5474551 | WO9706742 | US5676703 | US5741255 |