EP1573884 - COOLED ELECTRICAL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bianchi, Gianfranco Via Corsica 21/9 16128 Genova / IT | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Turati 32 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/37] | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Turati 32 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02808227.9 | 12.12.2002 | [2005/37] | WO2002IT00784 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054072 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573884 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/00, F02B63/04 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
F02B63/04 (EP,US);
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
H02K7/1815 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP,US);
F02B63/044 (EP,US);
F25B2327/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEKÜHLTER ELEKTRISCHER GENERATOR | [2005/37] | English: | COOLED ELECTRICAL GENERATOR | [2005/37] | French: | GENERATEUR ELECTRIQUE REFROIDI | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4658771 (RAVIN ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 2, line 64; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 24 - column 4, line 34 * [A] 3 [Y] 2; | [X]DE10001618 (MEULEMAN ANDRE [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 35; figure 1 *; | [YA]US4173951 (ISHIHARA MASAMITSU [JP]) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 64; figure 1 * [A] 5; | [A]DE2919237 (MOTOREN WERKE MANNHEIM AG) [A] 4,8 * page 2, line 9 - page 2, line 22 * * page 7, line 5 - page 7, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3143366 (BEDIA MASCHF VERWALT [DE]) [A] 10 * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 8 * * page 14, line 16 - page 14, line 32; figures 1-4 * |