EP1577248 - ELEVATOR APPARATUS AND SPEED ADJUSTING ROPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Mineo, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Kenichi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
KUGIYA, Takuo, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2013/10] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
OKADA, Mineo, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
OKAMOTO, Kenichi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
KUGIYA, Takuo, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02808325.1 | 25.12.2002 | [2005/38] | WO2002JP13515 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004058620 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577248 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577248 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B66B5/044 (EP);
B66B5/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/44] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG UND GESCHWINDIGKEITSANPASSUNGSSEIL | [2013/10] | English: | ELEVATOR APPARATUS AND SPEED ADJUSTING ROPE | [2005/38] | French: | ASCENSEUR ET CORDE DE REGLAGE DE LA VITESSE | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/38] | AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG UND GESCHWINDIGKEITSANPASSUNGSKABEL | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2004 | Translation filed | 20.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 17.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0628510 (KONE OY [FI]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]JPH0867447 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC BILL TECH) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001354372 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH0867447 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC BILL TECH); | [A]JPH11124284 (TOSHIBA F A SYSTEM ENG, et al); | [A]JP2727876B |