EP1327650 - Production process for ethylene oxide copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55, Nishi-shichijo Higashikubo-cho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55, Nishi-shichijo Higashikubo-cho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | |||
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55, Nishi-shichijo Higashikubo-cho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kono, Michiyuki 14-1, Kori-Hondori-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0082 / JP | 02 /
Kikuta, Manabu 16-19, Kusauchi-Hatta Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0311 / JP | 03 /
Nishiura, Masahito 6-3-107, Hanazono-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8187 / JP | 04 /
Tamura, Fumihide 1-2, Hirai 5-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0023 / JP | 05 /
Toba, Taketo 129-8, Yamamotomaruhashi 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0815 / JP | 06 /
Takamiya, Shigetaka Hamada-Shataku G-304, 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP | 07 /
Saeki, Koichiro 4-10-406, Shakutani Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0818 / JP | 08 /
Takei, Kazuo 6-38-606, Minamitakahama-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0025 / JP | 09 /
Kuriyama, Toshiaki 1-22-20, Shishigaya, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0073 / JP | 10 /
Yukitake, Masashi Nakahararyo-105, 3-5-3, Shimoshinjo, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0042 / JP | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000088.9 | 08.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | JP20020006725 | 15.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002006725 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327650 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327650 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/02, C08G65/26 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
C08G65/14 (EP,US);
C08G65/08 (KR);
C08G65/2696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/19] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellverfahren für Ethylenoxid-Copolymere | [2003/29] | English: | Production process for ethylene oxide copolymer | [2003/29] | French: | Procédé de préparation de copolymères d oxyde éthylène | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 17.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3029216 (BAILEY JR FREDERICK E, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]US4195167 (HOY KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 1; claims 13,17; tables 1-8 * * column 14, lines 3-6,42-64 * * column 4, lines 36-49 *; | [A]EP1130044 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-6 * examples 1-3; tables 1,2 * * page 6, lines 1-3,9-13 *; | [XP]EP1258502 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [XP] 1-6 * examples 1-5 together with p. 8 l. 17-25 * * in particular referential examples 1,2 on pages 18,19 together with p. 8 l. 17-25 * * page 9, lines 4-9,37-39 * |